Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/31/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/31/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/01/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/01/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/16/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/17/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/18/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/18/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/18/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/22/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/22/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/22/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/22/2008