Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/30/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/08/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/08/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/16/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/16/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/27/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/27/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/19/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/19/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/19/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/09/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/06/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/07/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/07/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/07/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/19/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 10/10/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/16/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/14/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/24/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/24/2008