Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/15/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/15/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/15/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/15/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/15/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/15/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/15/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/15/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/15/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/15/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/17/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/22/2008