Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/25/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/25/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/25/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/25/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/25/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/25/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/25/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/25/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/08/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/08/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/08/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2008