Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/10/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/11/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/11/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/12/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/17/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/17/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/19/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/26/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/08/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/08/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/08/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/08/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/14/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/23/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/23/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/23/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/29/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/29/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/29/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/29/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/31/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/31/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/31/2008
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/31/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/31/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/31/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/09/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/09/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/15/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/17/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/17/2008