Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/22/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/22/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/22/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/04/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/04/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/04/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/04/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/04/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/04/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/04/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/12/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/12/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/12/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/24/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/24/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/24/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/16/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/31/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/16/2008