Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/31/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/31/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/02/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/02/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/02/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/02/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/02/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/02/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/08/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/16/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/16/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/16/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/16/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/16/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/16/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/16/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/16/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/16/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/16/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/16/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/16/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/16/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/16/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/17/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/17/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/17/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/22/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/30/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/30/2008