Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/06/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/06/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/06/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/06/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/06/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/06/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/06/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/06/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/06/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/06/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/07/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/08/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/08/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/14/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/15/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/15/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/19/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/19/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/19/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/19/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/22/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/22/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/05/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/09/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/11/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/19/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/19/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/19/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/19/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/19/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/20/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/20/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/20/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/26/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/26/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/26/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/09/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/09/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/09/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/09/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/09/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/09/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/09/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/09/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/09/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/10/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/10/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/14/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/14/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/15/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/22/2008