Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/09/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 01/09/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 01/09/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/11/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/11/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/11/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/12/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/12/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/12/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/18/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 01/19/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/19/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/22/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/22/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/23/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/23/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/23/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/23/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/23/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/23/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/23/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 01/23/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/23/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/23/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/23/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/23/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/23/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/23/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/23/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/23/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/23/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/23/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 01/23/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/23/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/23/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/24/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/31/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/05/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/28/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/12/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/13/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/13/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/07/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/07/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/09/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/09/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/10/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/14/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/14/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/24/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/11/2007