Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 08/02/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/10/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/14/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/14/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/14/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/14/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/14/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/14/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/14/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/14/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/17/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/17/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/17/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/18/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/18/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/24/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/24/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/24/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/24/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/24/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/25/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/25/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/25/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/27/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/01/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/01/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/02/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/02/2007