Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 06/27/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 06/27/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 06/27/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/12/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/12/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/16/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/16/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/18/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/18/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/18/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/23/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/23/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/23/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/25/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 08/03/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 08/04/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/05/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/05/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/05/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/10/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/18/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/18/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/25/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/16/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/19/2007