Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/01/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/01/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/14/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/25/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/25/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/25/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/25/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/25/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/25/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/25/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/25/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/25/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/25/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/26/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/27/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/27/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/10/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/10/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/12/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/25/2007