Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/25/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/25/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/25/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/10/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/10/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/05/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/07/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/14/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/19/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/10/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/10/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/04/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/10/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/10/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/17/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/17/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/17/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/17/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/17/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/18/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/18/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/18/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/18/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/18/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/18/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/19/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/24/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/24/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/24/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/24/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/24/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/24/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/25/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/25/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/27/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/01/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/09/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/09/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/10/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/10/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/22/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/09/2007