Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/14/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/14/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/23/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/23/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/23/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/28/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/19/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/23/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/23/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/26/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/01/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/07/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/07/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/17/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/19/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/18/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/23/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/31/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/01/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 08/02/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/07/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/18/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/26/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/27/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/05/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/03/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/09/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/14/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/23/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew