Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/08/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/16/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/16/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/16/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/01/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/01/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/01/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/19/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/19/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/19/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/19/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/19/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/23/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/23/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/23/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/23/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/29/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/18/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/18/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/18/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/18/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/18/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/18/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/02/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/02/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/02/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/10/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/10/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/22/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/22/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/07/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/07/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/13/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/13/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/13/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/13/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/13/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/13/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/13/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/13/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/15/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/15/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/15/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/22/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/26/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/27/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/10/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/10/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/10/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/17/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/17/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/17/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/18/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/18/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/19/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/23/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/23/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/23/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/23/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/24/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/24/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/24/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 07/27/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/27/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/31/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/31/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/31/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/31/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 08/03/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/04/2007