Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/25/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/19/2007