Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/12/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/20/2007