Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/07/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/07/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/07/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/12/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/12/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/12/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/31/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/02/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew