Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/05/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 02/05/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/05/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/14/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/16/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/16/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/05/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/05/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/21/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/21/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/21/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/07/2007