Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/31/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/31/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/31/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/06/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/15/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/13/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/14/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/20/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/22/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/28/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/09/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/10/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/30/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/07/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/10/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/08/2008