Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/31/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/31/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/15/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/21/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/06/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/06/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/10/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/24/2008