Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/16/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/16/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/16/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/16/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/16/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/01/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/01/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/01/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/01/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/20/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/20/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/20/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/21/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/21/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/21/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/21/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/18/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/18/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/18/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/23/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/27/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/27/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/27/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/27/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/27/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/27/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/27/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/08/2008