Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/05/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/05/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/05/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/05/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/05/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/05/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/05/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/05/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/20/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/20/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/20/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/20/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/20/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/20/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/20/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/20/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/20/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/20/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/19/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/19/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/19/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/19/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/19/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/19/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/12/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/12/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/12/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/12/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/12/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/12/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/12/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/12/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/12/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/12/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/19/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/19/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/19/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/26/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/26/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/26/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/26/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 08/02/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 08/02/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/06/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/06/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/06/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/06/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/14/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/27/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/27/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/27/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/18/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/25/2007