Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/29/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/29/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 01/29/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 01/31/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/07/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/07/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/07/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/12/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/12/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/12/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/12/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/12/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/14/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/14/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/14/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/14/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/14/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/01/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/01/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/14/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/14/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/14/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/14/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/26/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/16/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/20/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/06/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/18/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/15/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/30/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/31/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/18/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/10/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/10/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/10/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/10/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/10/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/10/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/14/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/21/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/23/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/27/2008