Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/30/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/30/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/30/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 01/30/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/30/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 01/30/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/08/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/08/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/25/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/05/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/14/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/25/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/04/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/13/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/10/2008