Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/18/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/18/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 09/18/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 09/18/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/27/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/02/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/02/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/03/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/19/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 11/19/2008