Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/16/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/24/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/19/2008