Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 09/11/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/11/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/11/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/11/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/16/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/17/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/17/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/17/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/17/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/18/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/18/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/18/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/22/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/22/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/22/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/22/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/22/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/24/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/24/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/26/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/02/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/02/2008