Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 09/10/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 09/10/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 09/10/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 09/10/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 09/10/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/10/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/11/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/11/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/11/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/15/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/15/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/15/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/15/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/15/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/16/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/16/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/16/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/17/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/17/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/23/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/26/2008