Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 09/09/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/11/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/11/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/11/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 09/11/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/11/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/11/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/11/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/11/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/11/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/11/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/17/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/17/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/17/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/17/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/17/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/17/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/17/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/17/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/17/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/17/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/18/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/18/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/18/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/18/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 09/18/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/23/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/23/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/23/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/23/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/23/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/23/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/24/2008