Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/29/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/30/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/07/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/27/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/27/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/27/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/05/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/14/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/01/2007