Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 08/01/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/09/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/09/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/17/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/23/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/29/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/29/2008