Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 07/31/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 08/01/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 08/01/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/01/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 08/01/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 08/01/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 08/01/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/01/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 08/01/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 08/01/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 08/01/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 08/01/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/01/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/01/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 08/01/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 08/01/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 08/01/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 08/01/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 08/01/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 08/01/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 08/01/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 08/01/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 08/01/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 08/01/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/01/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 08/01/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 08/01/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 08/01/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 08/01/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 08/01/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/01/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 08/01/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 08/01/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/01/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 08/01/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 08/01/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 08/01/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 08/01/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 08/01/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 08/01/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 08/01/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 08/01/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 08/01/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 08/01/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 08/01/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 08/01/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 08/01/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 08/01/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 08/01/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 08/01/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 08/01/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 08/01/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 08/01/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/01/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 08/01/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/01/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/09/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/09/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/09/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/09/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/09/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/09/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/09/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/09/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/09/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/10/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/16/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/24/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/24/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/24/2008