Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/31/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 07/31/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 08/01/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 08/01/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 08/01/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 08/01/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/08/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/08/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/08/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/08/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/08/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/08/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/08/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/08/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/08/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/08/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/08/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/10/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/10/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/10/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/10/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/10/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/10/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/11/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/11/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/11/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/16/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/16/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/16/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/16/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/16/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/16/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/16/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/18/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/18/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/18/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/03/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/03/2008