Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/30/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/30/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/30/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/30/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/11/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/16/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/24/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/26/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/26/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/26/2008