Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/26/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/28/2007