Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/23/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 07/23/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/23/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/23/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/30/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 08/01/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/11/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/17/2008