Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 07/22/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/22/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 07/22/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 07/22/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/22/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 07/22/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/22/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 07/22/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 07/22/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/23/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/23/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/23/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/23/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/23/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/23/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/23/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/23/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/23/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/23/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/23/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/23/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/23/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/23/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/23/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/23/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/24/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/24/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/24/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/24/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/24/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/24/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/24/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/24/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/28/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/28/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/28/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/30/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 08/01/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 08/01/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/08/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/08/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/09/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/09/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/09/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/10/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/11/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/11/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/16/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/16/2008