Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 01/24/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/29/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/29/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/29/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/29/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 01/30/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/30/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/05/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/05/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/07/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/13/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/06/2007