Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/22/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/22/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/22/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/22/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/23/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/23/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/23/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/23/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/29/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/29/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/29/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/29/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/29/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/29/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/29/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/29/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/29/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/29/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/29/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/29/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/29/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/30/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/31/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/31/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/31/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/31/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/31/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/31/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/08/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/08/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/08/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/11/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/11/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/11/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/11/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/11/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/15/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/15/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/16/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/16/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/18/2008