Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/15/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/16/2008
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/16/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/16/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/16/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/17/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/31/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/09/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/09/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/09/2008