Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/14/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/14/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/22/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/31/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/09/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/16/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/02/2008