Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/16/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/16/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/21/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/21/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/21/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/21/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/23/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/23/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/23/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/29/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/30/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/30/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/30/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/30/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/30/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/30/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/31/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/31/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/10/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/16/2008