Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/18/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 06/18/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/09/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/09/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/09/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/09/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/10/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/17/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/22/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/29/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 08/01/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/01/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/11/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/24/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/24/2008