Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/10/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/12/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/12/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/12/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/19/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/23/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/23/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/22/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/17/2008