Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/29/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/06/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/07/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/14/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/05/2007