Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/22/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/24/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/24/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/24/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/24/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/24/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/29/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/29/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/29/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/29/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/29/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/29/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/29/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/29/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/29/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/30/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/30/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/30/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/30/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/30/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/30/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/30/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/30/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/30/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/30/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/30/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/30/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/30/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/30/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/30/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/30/2007
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 01/30/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/30/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/30/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/05/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/05/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/05/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/05/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/06/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/06/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/06/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/06/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/06/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/06/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/06/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/06/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/07/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 02/07/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/07/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/07/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/07/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/07/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/08/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/08/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/08/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/08/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/14/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/14/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/15/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/28/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/28/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/28/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/28/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/15/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/21/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/21/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/22/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/18/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/02/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/15/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/13/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/30/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/07/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/05/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/16/2008