Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/09/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/11/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/25/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/09/2008