Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/22/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/22/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/22/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/22/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/22/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/03/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/03/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 06/09/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/09/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/09/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/09/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/10/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/10/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/12/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/12/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/12/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/12/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/17/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/17/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/18/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/18/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/18/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/18/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/19/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/19/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/19/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/20/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/26/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/15/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/22/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/22/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/22/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/22/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/24/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/08/2008