Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/22/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/22/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/22/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/22/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/22/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/22/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/22/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/22/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/22/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/22/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/22/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/03/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/03/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/03/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/03/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/05/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/05/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/05/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/05/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/05/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/05/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 06/05/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/05/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/10/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/10/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/11/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/11/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/11/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/11/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/11/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/11/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/11/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/11/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/11/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/11/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/11/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/11/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/11/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/11/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/12/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/12/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/12/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/12/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/12/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/12/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/12/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/17/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/17/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/17/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/17/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/19/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/19/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/23/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/23/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/23/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/25/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/25/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/09/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/09/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/09/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/09/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/09/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/09/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/14/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/22/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/24/2008